NY S07149 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to political contributions by limited liability companies; requires limited liability companies that make expenditures for a political purpose to file with the state board of elections, the identity of all direct and indirect owners of the membership interests in the limited liability company and the proportion of each direct or indirect member's ownership interest in the limited liability company.
Title
Relates to political contributions by limited liability companies; requires limited liability companies that make expenditures for a political purpose to file with the state board of elections, the identity of all direct and indirect owners of the membership interests in the limited liability company and the proportion of each direct or indirect member's ownership interest in the limited liability company.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Jose Peralta [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-19 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09758 (Same As) 2018-04-17 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS