NY A09758 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to political contributions by limited liability companies; requires limited liability companies that make expenditures for a political purpose to file with the state board of elections, the identity of all direct and indirect owners of the membership interests in the limited liability company and the proportion of each direct or indirect member's ownership interest in the limited liability company.
Title
Relates to political contributions by limited liability companies; requires limited liability companies that make expenditures for a political purpose to file with the state board of elections, the identity of all direct and indirect owners of the membership interests in the limited liability company and the proportion of each direct or indirect member's ownership interest in the limited liability company.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.705 |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | print number 9758a |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S07149 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES