NY S07142 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the proof of acknowledgment of the agreement of the parties in an action or proceeding.
Title
Relates to the proof of acknowledgment of the agreement of the parties in an action or proceeding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.524 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |