NY S07081 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7648
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7648
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the electronic appearance of a defendant in the county of Steuben.
Title
Permits the electronic appearance of a defendant in the county of Steuben.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7648 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1436 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-05-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07648 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - signed chap.242