NY A07648 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the electronic appearance of a defendant in the county of Steuben.
Title
Permits the electronic appearance of a defendant in the county of Steuben.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.242 |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1436 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7081 |
2022-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.605 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07081 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7648