NY S07047 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage deer and bear.
Title
Extends provisions relating to the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage deer and bear.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7569 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1419 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07569 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - signed chap.207