NY A07569 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - signed chap.207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - signed chap.207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage deer and bear.
Title
Extends provisions relating to the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage deer and bear.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Assembly | signed chap.207 |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1419 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7047 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.147 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.147 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-14 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07047 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7569