NY S07047 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-18 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-18 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to licensing the practice of polysomnographic technology; establishes requirements and procedures for professional licensure and registration; allows limited permits to be issued to eligible applicants; establishes mandatory continuing education for licensed polysomnographic technologists.
Title
Relates to licensing the practice of polysomnographic technology; establishes requirements and procedures for professional licensure and registration; allows limited permits to be issued to eligible applicants; establishes mandatory continuing education for licensed polysomnographic technologists.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Foley [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | referred to higher education | |
2010-05-18 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-05-18 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-05-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-05-05 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-05-04 | 1ST REPORT CAL.491 | |
2010-04-14 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-03-09 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A9546 (Same As) 2010-06-09 - print number 9546a