NY S07032 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - PRINT NUMBER 7032A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - PRINT NUMBER 7032A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a twenty-five year retirement program for members of the NYC employees' retirement system employed as water supply police; provides for employer pick-up of certain additional member contributions required to be made by certain participants in the 25-year retirement programs.
Title
Establishes a twenty-five year retirement program for members of the NYC employees' retirement system employed as water supply police; provides for employer pick-up of certain additional member contributions required to be made by certain participants in the 25-year retirement programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7032A |
2022-05-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07902 (Same As) 2022-05-05 - print number 7902a