NY S07018 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Microbead-free waters act" to prohibit sale of personal cosmetic products containing microbeads.
Title
Enacts the "Microbead-free waters act" to prohibit sale of personal cosmetic products containing microbeads.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7018A |
2014-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-04-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08744 (Same As) 2014-05-05 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION