NY A08744 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-05 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-05 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Microbead-free waters act" to prohibit the sale of personal cosmetic products containing microbeads.
Title
Enacts the "Microbead-free waters act" to prohibit the sale of personal cosmetic products containing microbeads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8744a |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.490 |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | reported |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07018 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES