NY S06952 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.311
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.311
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including the Hoosic River in the definition of "inland waterways" for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Relates to including the Hoosic River in the definition of "inland waterways" for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.311 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.402 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a9149b |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-02 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6952A |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.862 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09149 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s6952a