CA AB1972 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 167, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 167, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13899 of the Penal Code, relating to theft, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Regional property crimes task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-12 - Assembly - AB 1972 Alanis Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1972 Alanis et al. By Wilk Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1972 Alanis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1972 Alanis et al. By Wilk Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1972 Alanis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 167, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-08-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-08-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2024-08-12 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6269.). |
2024-08-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-08 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5008.). |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2024-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5506.) |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13899 | Amended Code | Citation Text |