NY S06950 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes uniform procedures authorizing municipalities to grant building permits upon certification by a licensed professional engineer or a registered architect in good standing for certain alterations to existing residential or commercial buildings which do not alter load bearing walls, accessibility that is compliant with the ADA or fire egress and which maintains fire ratings.
Title
Establishes uniform procedures authorizing municipalities to grant building permits upon certification by a licensed professional engineer or a registered architect in good standing for certain alterations to existing residential or commercial buildings which do not alter load bearing walls, accessibility that is compliant with the ADA or fire egress and which maintains fire ratings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1372 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-02-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6950A |
2018-02-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2017-11-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08894 (Same As) 2018-02-22 - print number 8894a