NY S06950 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing a vehicle owned and identified as being owned by a political subdivision to operate in combination with other vehicles so authorized.
Title
Relates to authorizing a vehicle owned and identified as being owned by a political subdivision to operate in combination with other vehicles so authorized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1267 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6950A |
2016-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |