NY S06898 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - PRINT NUMBER 6898A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - PRINT NUMBER 6898A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding certain notice requirements for enforcing liens on goods in self-storage facilities; extends the demand for payment period to 60 days.
Title
Relates to adding certain notice requirements for enforcing liens on goods in self-storage facilities; extends the demand for payment period to 60 days.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6898A |
2022-05-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00662 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - amended on third reading (t) 662a