NY A00662 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - amended on third reading (t) 662a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - amended on third reading (t) 662a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding certain notice requirements for enforcing liens on goods in self-storage facilities; extends the demand for payment period to 60 days.
Title
Relates to adding certain notice requirements for enforcing liens on goods in self-storage facilities; extends the demand for payment period to 60 days.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 662a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.41 |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.287 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06898 (Same As) 2022-05-06 - PRINT NUMBER 6898A