NY S06887 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - SIGNED CHAP.328
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - SIGNED CHAP.328
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the education law, in relation to the interstate compact on educational opportunity for military children (Part A); amends the education law, in relation to in-state tuition at colleges and universities of the state university of New York and the city university of New York (Part B); amends the executive law, in relation to the New York state supplemental burial allowance for members of the armed forces of the United States killed in combat or duty subject to hostile fire or imminent danger, as defined in 37 USC Section 310(a)(4) (Part C); and amends the real property law, in relation to authorizing the department of state to issue certain real estate and brokers licenses (Part D).
Title
Amends the education law, in relation to the interstate compact on educational opportunity for military children (Part A); amends the education law, in relation to in-state tuition at colleges and universities of the state university of New York and the city university of New York (Part B); amends the executive law, in relation to the New York state supplemental burial allowance for members of the armed forces of the United States killed in combat or duty subject to hostile fire or imminent danger, as defined in 37 USC Section 310(a)(4) (Part C); and amends the real property law, in relation to authorizing the department of state to issue certain real estate and brokers licenses (Part D).
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. Greg Ball [R] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Sen. Terry Gipson [D] | Sen. Lee Zeldin [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.328 |
2014-08-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.470 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9216a |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1563 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6887A |
2014-06-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2014-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09216 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6887a