NY S06869 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Huntington, county of Suffolk, to accept from the Joshua Baptist Church, an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Huntington, county of Suffolk, to accept from the Joshua Baptist Church, an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.9 |
2020-09-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.187 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.138 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a10221 |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2020-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.278 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6869A |
2020-01-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-11-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10221 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.9