NY S06864 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.343
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.343
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of the Albany county correctional facility for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court in the county of Albany.
Title
Authorizes the use of the Albany county correctional facility for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court in the county of Albany.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.343 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.202 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9540a |
2012-05-08 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2012-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.685 |
2012-04-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6864A |
2012-04-25 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2012-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09540 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - substituted by s6864a