NY S06834 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - PRINT NUMBER 6834B
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - PRINT NUMBER 6834B
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notification of a security breach; includes credit and debit card; increases civil penalties.
Title
Relates to notification of a security breach; includes credit and debit card; increases civil penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6834B |
2016-06-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2016-05-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6834A |
2016-05-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2016-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A10475 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - ordered to third reading rules cal.374