NY S06801 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.231
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.231
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for rifle hunting in Cayuga county.
Title
Allows for rifle hunting in Cayuga county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.231 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.308 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a9638a |
2012-05-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.598 |
2012-04-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6801A |
2012-04-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2012-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09638 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - substituted by s6801a