NY S06731 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - PRINT NUMBER 6731A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - PRINT NUMBER 6731A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases loan reimbursement for certain attorneys who work in legal services with indigent clients from $3,400 to $5,500.
Title
Increases loan reimbursement for certain attorneys who work in legal services with indigent clients from $3,400 to $5,500.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6731A |
2018-01-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A06712 (Same As) 2018-01-30 - print number 6712a