NY A06712 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - print number 6712a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - print number 6712a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases loan reimbursement for certain attorneys who work in legal services with indigent clients from $3,400 to $5,500.
Title
Increases loan reimbursement for certain attorneys who work in legal services with indigent clients from $3,400 to $5,500.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Assembly | print number 6712a |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06731 (Same As) 2018-01-18 - PRINT NUMBER 6731A