NY S06711 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - PRINT NUMBER 6711A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - PRINT NUMBER 6711A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to possession of firearms on property owned by or held in trust for SUNY ESF.
Title
Relates to possession of firearms on property owned by or held in trust for SUNY ESF.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6711A |
2014-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2014-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08826 (Same As) 2014-05-28 - enacting clause stricken
A10057 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - referred to codes
A10057 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - referred to codes