NY S06705 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of a distinctive license plate for Iraq War and War in Afghanistan veterans.
Title
Relates to the issuance of a distinctive license plate for Iraq War and War in Afghanistan veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6705A |
2016-06-09 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-09 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1109 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03664 (Same As) 2016-06-10 - enacting clause stricken
A10665 (Same As) 2016-06-10 - referred to transportation
A10665 (Same As) 2016-06-10 - referred to transportation