NY S06683 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for implementation of statewide opioid settlement agreements; creates an opioid settlement fund.
Title
Provides for implementation of statewide opioid settlement agreements; creates an opioid settlement fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1212 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02466 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse