NY S06680 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical corrections relating to the authorization of a real property tax exemption for Word of Truth Church, Inc. in Suffolk county.
Title
Makes technical corrections relating to the authorization of a real property tax exemption for Word of Truth Church, Inc. in Suffolk county.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Murray [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.454 |
2023-09-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.831 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a6915 |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2023-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1117 |
2023-05-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06915 (Same As) 2023-06-10 - substituted by s6680