NY S06622 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting fees to be charged to agencies for copies of certain clinical records.
Title
Relates to prohibiting fees to be charged to agencies for copies of certain clinical records.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9117 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1177 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09117 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - signed chap.453