NY A09117 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting fees to be charged to agencies for copies of certain clinical records.
Title
Relates to prohibiting fees to be charged to agencies for copies of certain clinical records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.453 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1177 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6622 |
2016-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.808 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S06622 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9117