NY S06585 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Jamestown, county of Chautauqua, to discontinue the use of certain lands as parklands and requires the dedication of other certain parcels of land for public park purposes.
Title
Authorizes the city of Jamestown, county of Chautauqua, to discontinue the use of certain lands as parklands and requires the dedication of other certain parcels of land for public park purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.315 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.546 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a9493a |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6585A |
2012-06-11 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-06-08 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-23 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2012-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-23 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.828 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09493 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s6585a