NY S06571 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to making certain technical corrections to chapter 36 of the laws of 2019 relating to rent control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to making certain technical corrections to chapter 36 of the laws of 2019 relating to rent control.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1658
2019-06-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 6571A
2019-06-17SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2019-06-16SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08413 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - amend and recommit to rules 8413a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback