NY A08413 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to making certain technical corrections to chapter 36 of the laws of 2019 relating to rent control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to making certain technical corrections to chapter 36 of the laws of 2019 relating to rent control.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-17Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 8413a
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-16Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S06571 (Same As) 2020-02-19 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback