NY S06513 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - PRINT NUMBER 6513B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - PRINT NUMBER 6513B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits retail dealers of second hand motor vehicles from selling a motor vehicle which is subject to federal motor vehicle safety standards for inflatable restraint systems unless such vehicle is equipped with an inflatable restraint system which conforms to the federal motor vehicle safety standard applicable to that vehicle and a readiness indicator light indicating a functioning inflatable restraint system.
Title
Prohibits retail dealers of second hand motor vehicles from selling a motor vehicle which is subject to federal motor vehicle safety standards for inflatable restraint systems unless such vehicle is equipped with an inflatable restraint system which conforms to the federal motor vehicle safety standard applicable to that vehicle and a readiness indicator light indicating a functioning inflatable restraint system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6513B |
2020-07-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-02-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6513A |
2020-02-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08308 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - amended on third reading (t) 8308b