NY S06485 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8630A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8630A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits providers from imposing a fee for termination or early cancellation of certain service contracts in the event a customer has deceased before the end of such contract.
Title
Prohibits providers from imposing a fee for termination or early cancellation of certain service contracts in the event a customer has deceased before the end of such contract.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8630A |
2016-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6485A |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1074 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08630 (Same As) 2016-09-27 - signed chap.331