NY A08630 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - signed chap.331
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - signed chap.331
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits providers from imposing a fee for termination or early cancellation of certain service contracts in the event a customer has deceased before the end of such contract.
Title
Prohibits providers from imposing a fee for termination or early cancellation of certain service contracts in the event a customer has deceased before the end of such contract.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-27 | Senate | signed chap.331 |
2016-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1074 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6485A |
2016-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.285 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.285 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | print number 8630a |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2015-12-23 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S06485 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8630A