NY S06482 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7938
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7938
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage black sea bass; extends provisions to December 31, 2020.
Title
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage black sea bass; extends provisions to December 31, 2020.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7938 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1967 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07938 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - signed chap.207