NY A07938 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage black sea bass; extends provisions to December 31, 2020.
Title
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage black sea bass; extends provisions to December 31, 2020.
Sponsors
Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] |
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. Jaime Williams [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Senate | signed chap.207 |
2017-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1967 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6482 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.252 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.252 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06482 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7938