NY S06418 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.98
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.98
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to opportunities for small businesses and businesses owned by women and minorities.
Title
Relates to opportunities for small businesses and businesses owned by women and minorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.98 |
2019-07-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.577 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a8407 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1718 |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6418A |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08407 (Same As) 2019-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.98