NY S06418 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the penalties for the confinement of companion animals in vehicles at times of extreme temperature.
Title
Relates to the penalties for the confinement of companion animals in vehicles at times of extreme temperature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6418A |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.504 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A08563 (Same As) 2014-06-03 - reported referred to codes