NY S06401 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.324
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the city of Schenectady to alienate certain parcels of land used as parkland and to acquire other parcels of land to replace such parkland.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the city of Schenectady to alienate certain parcels of land used as parkland and to acquire other parcels of land to replace such parkland.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-13AssemblySIGNED CHAP.324
2017-09-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.572
2017-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a8339
2017-06-15Assemblyreferred to cities
2017-06-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-15SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2017-06-15SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1810
2017-06-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 6401A
2017-06-09SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2017-06-06SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-16SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A07844 (Same As) 2017-06-02 - enacting clause stricken
A08339 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6401a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06401&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06401&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06401
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06401&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06401A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6401#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6401#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6401#SC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06401&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback