NY A08339 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6401a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6401a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Schenectady to alienate certain parcels of land used as parkland and to acquire other parcels of land to replace such parkland.
Title
Authorizes the city of Schenectady to alienate certain parcels of land used as parkland and to acquire other parcels of land to replace such parkland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6401a |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.572 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-09 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S06401 (Same As) 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.324