NY S06395 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the regulation of the profession and practice of applied behavior analysis.
Title
Provides for the regulation of the profession and practice of applied behavior analysis.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8518 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.146 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02027 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - reported referred to codes
S06290 (Same As) 2014-01-28 - referred to codes
A08518 (Same As) 2014-03-17 - signed chap.8
S06290 (Same As) 2014-01-28 - referred to codes
A08518 (Same As) 2014-03-17 - signed chap.8