NY A02027 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes no itinerant vendor, except for a manufacturer, an authorized manufacturer's representative, or authorized distributor, shall offer for sale baby food, nonprescription drugs, cosmetics or batteries.
Title
Establishes no itinerant vendor, except for a manufacturer, an authorized manufacturer's representative, or authorized distributor, shall offer for sale baby food, nonprescription drugs, cosmetics or batteries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to economic development |