NY S06346 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7119
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7119
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for standard minimum nursing home staffing levels by regulations promulgated by the commissioner of health.
Title
Provides for standard minimum nursing home staffing levels by regulations promulgated by the commissioner of health.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7119 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.733 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07119 (Same As) 2021-06-18 - signed chap.156