NY S06342 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-15 - PRINT NUMBER 6342D
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-15 - PRINT NUMBER 6342D
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the development of plans to adequately address military sexual trauma experienced by female veterans.
Title
Relates to the development of plans to adequately address military sexual trauma experienced by female veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Huntley [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Adriano Espaillat [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6342D |
2012-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2012-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6342C |
2012-06-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2012-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6342B |
2012-05-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2012-02-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6342A |
2012-02-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2012-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A10312 (Same As) 2012-05-22 - referred to veterans' affairs