NY S06294 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.86
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.86
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the developmental disabilities advisory council to evaluate and produce a report on the state's response to the COVID-19 state disaster emergency as it relates to individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities with assistance from OPWDD and the department of health.
Title
Requires the developmental disabilities advisory council to evaluate and produce a report on the state's response to the COVID-19 state disaster emergency as it relates to individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities with assistance from OPWDD and the department of health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.86 |
2021-12-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.711 |
2021-12-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.474 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a7381a |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6294A |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1025 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07381 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6294a