NY A07381 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6294a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the developmental disabilities advisory council to evaluate and produce a report on the state's response to the COVID-19 state disaster emergency as it relates to individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities with assistance from OPWDD and the department of health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the developmental disabilities advisory council to evaluate and produce a report on the state's response to the COVID-19 state disaster emergency as it relates to individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities with assistance from OPWDD and the department of health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07Assemblysubstituted by s6294a
2021-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.474
2021-06-07Assemblyreported
2021-06-01Assemblyprint number 7381a
2021-06-01Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to rules
2021-05-26Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-11Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-05-06Assemblyreferred to people with disabilities

Same As/Similar To

S06294 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A7381
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07381&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07381
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07381&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07381A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07381&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07381&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07381&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments 750

feedback