NY S06269 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3766
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3766
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires applicants for public assistance to be given notice in writing, that they may be liable to reimburse the state for benefits received; provides such notice shall be given as part of an informational booklet and as a standalone document.
Title
Requires applicants for public assistance to be given notice in writing, that they may be liable to reimburse the state for benefits received; provides such notice shall be given as part of an informational booklet and as a standalone document.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3766 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1558 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A03766 (Same As) 2021-10-08 - signed chap.448