NY S06251 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Halesite Fire District to file an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Title
Authorizes the Halesite Fire District to file an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.600 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a6191a |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1198 |
2024-05-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6251A |
2024-05-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06191 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - substituted by s6251a